HI SB483 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB483
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the use of private lands for the ohana zones pilot program. Provides additional time for the implementation of the ohana zones pilot program. Extends sunset dates of the Emergency Department Homelessness Assessment and Medical Respite pilot programs of the Department of Human Services to 6/30/2020. Requires reports to the Legislature. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Homelessness.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from HMS/HOU/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 521) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Inouye, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Fevella. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) S. Chang, Kanuha, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki, Fevella. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere, Fevella. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS/HOU/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-19 2:55PM in conference room 016. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Re-Referred to HMS/HOU/GVO, WAM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HMS/HOU, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB483 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Subjects
DHS
Emergency Department Homelessness Assessment Pilot Program
Homelessness
Housing
Human Services
Medical Respite Pilot Program
Ohana Zones Pilot Program
Shelters
Emergency Department Homelessness Assessment Pilot Program
Homelessness
Housing
Human Services
Medical Respite Pilot Program
Ohana Zones Pilot Program
Shelters