HI SB496 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB496
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of education to provide training on social and emotional learning to all youth-serving educators, health care professionals and counselors, and agencies and programs, as well as parents of students enrolled in public schools or public charter schools. Appropriates funds to the department of education to conduct training on social and emotional learning.
Title
Relating To Social And Emotional Learning.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] |
Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 405) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, K. Kahele, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Riviere. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-17 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB579 (Same As) 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
SB496 (Carry Over) 2017-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
SB496 (Carry Over) 2017-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Department of Education
Keiki Caucus
Public Charter Schools
Public Schools
Social and Emotional Learning
Training
Department of Education
Keiki Caucus
Public Charter Schools
Public Schools
Social and Emotional Learning
Training
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=496&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB496_.HTM |