HI SB529 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB529
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-19 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-19 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the right of persons to record law enforcement activities. Establishes a private right of action for violations of the right. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Recordings Of Law Enforcement Activities.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 410) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, English, Baker, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-21 1:20PM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB529 (Carry Over) 2021-02-19 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
HB20 (Same As) 2021-01-27 - Referred to CMV, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
HB20 (Same As) 2021-01-27 - Referred to CMV, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1