HI SB530 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-09 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-09 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of general obligation bonds and appropriate funds for the planning and designing phase II renovations to the Kamuela vacuum cooling plant.
Title
CIP; Kamuela Vacuum Cooling Plant; General Obligation Bonds; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Reported from AGL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 40) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2015-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AGL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, Riviere, Taniguchi, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Wakai, Slom. |
2015-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-15 2:45PM in conference room 414. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to AGL, WAM. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=530&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/SB530_.HTM |