HI SB536 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-09 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-09 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides an income tax credit for qualified hotel construction and renovation for taxable years beginning in the period after December 31, 2014, through December 31, 2019. (SD1)
Title
Income Tax Credit; Hotel Construction and Renovation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Reported from TSI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 55) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on TSI recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TSI were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kahele, English, Taniguchi, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2015-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on TSI has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-15 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to TSI, WAM. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |