HI SB568 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-20 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-20 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a law enforcement standards board for the certification of county police officers, state public safety officers, and employees of the departments of transportation and land and natural resources with police powers. Beginning on 1/1/2018, prohibits appointment or hiring of these officers unless certified by the law enforcement standards board. Establishes a special fund. (SD1)
Title
Law Enforcement Standards Board; Special Fund; Appropriations ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-20 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDL. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Reported from PSM/TRA/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 409) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM/JDL. |
2015-02-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Galuteria, Ihara, Riviere, Ruderman, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2015-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRA were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Harimoto, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Nishihara, Dela Cruz, English, Inouye, Kidani, Kouchi ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2015-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Galuteria, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRA deferred the measure until 02-17-15 3:00PM in conference room 229. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM deferred the measure until 02-17-15 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL deferred the measure until 02-18-15 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/TRA/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-15 1:05PM in conference room 229. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to PSM/TRA/WTL, WAM/JDL. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |