HI SB578 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB578
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-04 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-04 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits commercial shark tour operations from operating without a permit. Requires the department of land and natural resources to adopt rules to regulate commercial shark tours. Effective 1/1/2022. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Commercial Shark Tours.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-04 | Senate | The committee on WAM deferred the measure. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | The committee on CPN deferred the measure. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN/WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-04-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/WAM. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 125) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN/WAM. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Re-Referred to WTL, CPN/WAM. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-21 1:00PM in conference room 229. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to WTL, CPN/JDC. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB578 (Carry Over) 2021-03-04 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.