HI SB586 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB586
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes transit oriented development community development districts. Authorizes the Hawaii community development authority to plan and develop infrastructure capacity at each of the transit stations established as transit oriented development community districts. Requires the authority to plan and develop infrastructure for state owned land surrounding one of the following rail stations: Aloha stadium, Kalihi, Iwilei, or leeward community college. Allows the authority to enter into public private partnerships.
Title
Relating To Transit Oriented Development Community Development Districts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-08 | Senate | The committee on TRE deferred the measure. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE deferred the measure until 02-08-17 1:41PM in conference room 225. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | The committee on WTL deferred the measure. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-17 2:00PM in conference room 225. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Re-Referred to TRE/WTL, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to ETT/TRE/WTL, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB586 (Carry Over) 2017-02-08 - The committee on TRE deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=586&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB586_.HTM |