HI SB603 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - The committee on TRS deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Repeals the requirement that a member of the National Guard, military reserve, or armed forces must be assigned to a unit in the State in order to qualify for a vehicle weight tax exemption. Clarifies that the vehicle weight tax exemption is available to service members who claim Hawaii as their residence of record.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Vehicle Weight Tax Exemption For Military Personnel.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-13SenateThe committee on TRS deferred the measure.
2019-02-13SenateThe committee on PSM deferred the measure.
2019-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on PSM/TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-19 1:15PM in conference room 225.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to PSM/TRS, WAM.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback