HI SB617 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to TSI/WLA, WAM.
Pending: Senate Tourism and International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to TSI/WLA, WAM.
Pending: Senate Tourism and International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Incorporates beach land conservation under the general powers of the board of land and natural resources. Expands the department of land and natural resources' beach restoration plans to include beach conservation plans. Requires beach restoration plans to include, where appropriate, county participation and the formation of private-public partnerships. Allows the department of land and natural resources to include studies about the effect of sea level rise and other coastal engineering studies when developing beach conservation plans that involve more than the nourishment of beaches with sand. Renames the "beach restoration special fund" as the "beach restoration and conservation special fund". Permits proceeds from the lease of public lands for an existing shoreline structure, matching funds to carry out a beach restoration and conservation plans, from private individuals or organizations, and transient accommodations tax revenues to be deposited into the beach restoration and conservation special fund. Allows moneys from the beach restoration and conservation special fund to be used for conservation projects and all things necessary, useful, and convenient in connection with the restoration and conservation of beach lands. Allocates $3,000,000 of transient accommodations tax revenues to the special land and development fund to be expended in accordance with the long-range strategic plan for tourism. Allocates an annual amount of $3,000,000 of transient accommodations tax revenues to the beach restoration and conservation special fund and requires the fund to maintain a balance of $7,000,000 once that balance is achieved. (SD1)
Title
Transient Accommodations Tax; Beach Restoration and Conservation Plan; Beach Restoration and Conservation Special Fund; Board of Land and Natural Resources; Hawaii Tourism Authority
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Gilbert Kahele [D] |
Sen. Laura Thielen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-21 | Senate | Re-Referred to TSI/WLA, WAM. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Reported from TSI/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 336) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Ihara, Riviere, Ruderman, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Slom. |
2015-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL deferred the measure until 02-13-15 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2015-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on TSI recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TSI were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kahele, English, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Slom. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on TSI/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-15 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to TSI/WTL, WAM. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB444 (Same As)