HI SB637 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB637
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-20 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-20 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a defendant who has been convicted of three misdemeanors in Waikiki to be sentenced to a probationary term of geographic restriction not exceeding years during which the defendant shall be prohibited from entering Waikiki during the hours of 6:00 p.m. to 6:00 a.m. Imposes imprisonment of thirty days for violation.
Title
Relating To Sentencing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-20 | Senate | The committee on JDC deferred the measure. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-20-19 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Re-Referred to JDC. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB637 (Carry Over) 2019-02-20 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
HB1304 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to TIA, JUD, referral sheet 6
HB1304 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to TIA, JUD, referral sheet 6
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=637&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB637_.HTM |