HI SB661 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Act 143, 06/26/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1245).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Act 143, 06/26/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1245).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Grants procurement priority for fuel cell electric vehicles for state and county vehicle purchases. Includes fuel cell electric vehicles in the definition of "electric vehicles" for purposes of parking fee exemption, high occupancy vehicle lane use, registration, and required parking spaces in places of public accommodation. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Fuel Cell Electric Vehicles.
Sponsors
Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] |
Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Senate | Act 143, 06/26/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1245). |
2019-07-01 | House | Act 143, on 06/26/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1245). |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883). |
2019-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968). |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har, Kong, Say, Tokioka voting no (4) and none excused (0). |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19. |
2019-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 157) as amended in (CD 1). |
2019-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 157). |
2019-04-26 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Aquino, Johanson, Cullen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Thielen. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Inouye, English, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 1:15PM in conference room 325. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-19 2:30PM in conference room 325. |
2019-04-23 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-24-19 2:30PM in conference room 325. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 826). |
2019-04-22 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 949). |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: L. Thielen Chair; Inouye, English Co-Chairs; Fevella. |
2019-04-22 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Lowen, Aquino, Johanson, Cullen Co-Chairs; Thielen. |
2019-04-05 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 685). |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Deferred One Day 04-05-19. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 545). |
2019-04-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Eli voting no (1) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1967), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-03-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Holt. |
2019-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-27-19 2:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-03-21 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Holt, Tokioka, Yamane excused (5). |
2019-03-21 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1554), recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-03-19 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Ichiyama, Kitagawa, McKelvey, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan. |
2019-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-19-19 9:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2019-03-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LAB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Nakamura, Quinlan, Takumi excused (4). |
2019-03-15 | House | Reported from EEP/TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1381) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LAB. |
2019-03-14 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashimoto, Cullen, Matayoshi, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Hashem. |
2019-03-14 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Har. |
2019-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/TRN on Thursday, 03-14-19 11:10AM in House conference room 325. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to EEP/TRN, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 210) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1168) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, K. Kahele, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-19-19 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from GVO/TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 526) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Harimoto, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Fevella. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Inouye, Baker, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO/TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-19 3:15PM in conference room 225. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to GVO/TRS, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |