HI SB662 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to TRN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits vehicle lessors from renting, leasing, or offering for rent or lease, vehicles subject to a manufacturer's recall, until appropriate repairs are made. Defines peer-to-peer vehicle sharing related terms. Requires persons in the peer-to-peer vehicle sharing organization business to register with the director of taxation. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Motor Vehicles.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07HouseReferred to TRN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 211) in amended form (SD 2).
2019-03-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-03-01SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 969) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2019-02-19SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 5 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi.
2019-02-15SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-19-19 9:30AM in conference room 211.
2019-02-15SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-02-15SenateReported from CPH/TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 585) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Harimoto, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Shimabukuro.
2019-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) J.Keohokalole.
2019-02-05SenateThe committee(s) on CPH/TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-19 1:00PM in conference room 225.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to CPH/TRS, WAM.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB241 (Same As) 2019-04-26 - The conference committee deferred the measure.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback