HI SB695 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB695
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Hawaiian Home Lands to digitize its applicant, beneficiary, and lessee records. Requires that the digital database be completed and available no later than July 1, 2020. (SB695 HD1)
Title
Relating To The Hawaiian Homes Commission Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-03-21 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Holt, Tokioka, Yamane excused (5). |
2019-03-21 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1530), recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-03-19 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Creagan, Lowen, Say, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, McKelvey, Morikawa, Yamane. |
2019-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-19-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-03-18 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-19-19. |
2019-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 03-18-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-03-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Nakamura, Quinlan, Takumi excused (4). |
2019-03-15 | House | Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1356) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2019-03-13 | House | The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Har, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WLH on Wednesday, 03-13-19 10:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 217) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 723) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Riviere. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-20-19 10:05AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 92) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, K. Kahele, Ihara, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) J.Keohokalole. |
2019-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-19 1:15PM in conference room 016. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HWN, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB259 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
SB695 (Carry Over) 2019-03-21 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Holt, Tokioka, Yamane excused (5).
SB695 (Carry Over) 2019-03-21 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Holt, Tokioka, Yamane excused (5).