HI SB707 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-28 - Referred to WAL/FIN, referral sheet 28
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-28 - Referred to WAL/FIN, referral sheet 28
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals chapter 171C, HRS, relating to the PLDC. Deposits funds appropriated to the DLNR, pursuant to Act 55, Session Laws of Hawaii 2011, into the land conservation fund. Deposits proceeds in the stadium facilities special fund and the school facilities special fund into the general fund. Transfers PLDC employees and assets to the DLNR. (SD2)
Title
DLNR; PLDC; Repeal; Land Conservation Fund; Employees; Transfer ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-28 | House | Referred to WAL/FIN, referral sheet 28 |
2013-02-20 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-02-19 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 29) in amended form (SD 2). |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 02-19-13. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 453) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2013-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-15-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Reported from EGH/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 212) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2013-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Shimabukuro, Dela Cruz, Ihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on EGH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EGH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Slom, Baker, English, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Wakai. |
2013-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on EGH/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-13 3:00PM in conference room 016. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to EGH/WTL, WAM. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB555 (Same As) 2013-02-25 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.