HI SB713 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB713
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-30 - Re-Referred to WAM/EET.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-30 - Re-Referred to WAM/EET.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a 1-time amnesty program for certain delinquent transient accommodations and general excise tax obligations. Allows transient accommodations brokers to register as a tax collection agent for its operators and plan managers. Requires registered tax collection agents to inquire with their operators and plan managers whether the transient accommodation is in compliance with all state and county land use and tax laws. Requires the operator or plan manager to provide verification of compliance with state and county land use laws. Requires an operator or plan manager to remove a transient accommodation advertisement upon notice that the property is not in compliance with state law or county ordinance. Makes it unlawful for transient accommodations brokers to engage in business with operators or plan managers that are not in compliance with all state laws and county ordinances. Authorizes counties to disgorge profits obtained through unfair or unlawful business practices. Authorizes counties to adopt ordinances to amortize or phase out transient vacation rental units. Allocates up to $1,000,000 of TAT tax revenues to each county, contingent upon the county establishing a process to provide verification of compliance by an operator or plan manager with county land use laws. Makes it unlawful for a hosting platform to collect a fee for booking services regarding transient vacation rentals that are not lawfully certified, registered, or permitted under applicable county ordinance. Appropriates funds.
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Tourism Authority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-30 | Senate | Re-Referred to WAM/EET. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to EET/PSM/CPH, JDC/WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB713 (Carry Over) 2019-01-30 - Re-Referred to WAM/EET.
Subjects
Appropriation
Appropriation ($)
General Excise Tax
Hawaii Tourism Authority
Operating Budget
Taxation
Tourism Special Fund
Transient Accommodations Tax
Vacation Rentals
Appropriation ($)
General Excise Tax
Hawaii Tourism Authority
Operating Budget
Taxation
Tourism Special Fund
Transient Accommodations Tax
Vacation Rentals
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=713&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB713_.HTM |