HI SB737 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB737
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Judiciary to establish a task force for restorative justice, which dissolves on 6/30/2021. Requires the judiciary to report to the legislature on its findings. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Restorative Justice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2559) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 02-04-20 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 01-28-20 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB634 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
SB737 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to JDC, WAM.
SB737 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to JDC, WAM.