HI SB741 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Limits the prohibition on the sale of Kakaako community development district lands by HCDA to certain specified lands within the Kakaako community development district. Requires the HCDA to determine the costs and benefits of selling and purchasing certain properties, except lands makai of Ala Moana boulevard and between Kewalo basin and the foreign trade zone, within the Kakaako community development district and report to the legislature. (SD1)
Title
Hawaii Community Development Authority; Kakaako Community Development District
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Reported from EGH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 101) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on EGH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EGH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Slom, English, L. Thielen, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Chun Oakland. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on EGH deferred the measure until 02-04-13 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2013-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on EGH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-13 3:00PM in conference room 016. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to EGH, WAM. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB476 (Same As) 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.