HI SB756 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-25 - (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 672).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-25 - (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 672).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an excise tax on direct broadcast satellite service providers. Modifies the renewable energy technologies income tax credit. Repeals the income tax exemption for stocks and stock options from a qualified high technology business. Effective July 1, 2011. (SB756 HD1)
Title
Taxation; Omnibus
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-25 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 672). | |
2011-04-21 | (H) House conferees appointed: M. Oshiro Chair; Chong, Choy, M. Lee, Marumoto. | |
2011-04-20 | (H) Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 653). | |
2011-04-20 | (S) Senator(s) Kim added as conferee(s). | |
2011-04-19 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 649). | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Fukunaga, Chair; Ige, Gabbard, Co-Chair(s); Baker. | |
2011-04-14 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 605). | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 465). | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fontaine, Pine, Thielen, Ward voting no (4) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-04-08 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Fontaine, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1). | |
2011-04-08 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1451) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-04-04 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Coffman, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Tokioka, Yamashita, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Morikawa; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Marumoto; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. | |
2011-04-01 | (H) Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 04-04-11 2:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to FIN, referral sheet 33 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 174) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 629) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2011-02-24 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Kouchi. | |
2011-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-11 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-02-18 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2011-02-18 | (S) Reported from EDT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 414) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2011-02-11 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDT were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Fukunaga, Wakai, Baker, Solomon, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT deferred the measure until 02-11-11 1:15PM in conference room 016. | |
2011-02-07 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT deferred the measure until 02-09-11 1:15PM in conference room 016. | |
2011-02-04 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 02-07-11 1:15PM in conference room 016. | |
2011-02-03 | (S) Re-Referred to EDT, WAM. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to WAM. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |