HI SB793 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-16 - (S) The committee on HTH deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-16 - (S) The committee on HTH deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes health care-associated infection reporting requirements. Requires the department of health to submit an update on health care-associated infection reporting to the legislature.
Title
Health care-Associated Infection Reporting; Department of Health
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-16 | (S) The committee on HTH deferred the measure. | |
2011-02-08 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-11 2:45PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to HTH, JDL. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=793 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/SB793_.HTM |