HI SB809 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-13 - (S) Act 003, 2/13/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1103).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-13 - (S) Act 003, 2/13/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1103).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the University of Hawaii's authorization to issue revenue bonds for the purpose of financing the construction and maintenance of qualifying capital improvement projects. Makes an emergency appropriation of revenue bond proceeds. (CD1)
Title
University of Hawaii; Authorization of Revenue Bonds; Emergency Appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-13 | (S) Act 003, 2/13/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1103). | |
2012-02-13 | (H) Act 003, on 2/13/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1103). | |
2012-01-31 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 4). | |
2012-01-30 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2012-01-30 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 3). | |
2012-01-30 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Luke excused (3). | |
2012-01-30 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 23 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 1 No(es): Senator(s) Taniguchi. 1 Excused: Senator(s) Tsutsui. | |
2012-01-27 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 01-30-12. | |
2012-01-27 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Monday, 1-30-12. | |
2012-01-27 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 3-12) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2012-01-27 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 3-12). | |
2012-01-20 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kidani, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-01-20 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, Yamashita, Nakashima, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Saiki, Tokioka. | |
2012-01-20 | (H) Received from Governor re: emergency appropriation (Gov. Msg. No. 182). | |
2012-01-18 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 01-20-12 1:30PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-04-28 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-11 2:00PM in conference room 329. | |
2011-04-26 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-11 2:30PM in conference room 329. | |
2011-04-21 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-11 1:30PM in conference room 329. | |
2011-04-20 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-11 2:30PM in conference room 329. | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 652). | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 643). | |
2011-04-18 | (H) House conferees appointed: Nishimoto, Yamashita Co-Chairs; Nakashima, Saiki, Tokioka, Johanson. | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Tokuda, Chair; Kidani, Co-Chair(s); Slom. | |
2011-04-14 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 605). | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 474). | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-04-08 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-12-11. | |
2011-04-08 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1486) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-30 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Coffman, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-03-28 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-30-11 12:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-03-23 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Belatti, Chang, Tokioka excused (3). | |
2011-03-23 | (H) Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1064), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-03-17 | (H) The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, Nakashima, Aquino, Awana, Belatti, Mizuno, Saiki, Takai, Takumi, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Chang, Hanohano, Wooley, Ching. | |
2011-03-15 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Thursday, 03-17-11 2:00PM in House conference room 309. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 33 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 192) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Taniguchi). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 784) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2011-02-25 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. | |
2011-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-25-11 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-02-09 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. | |
2011-02-09 | (S) Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 51) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. | |
2011-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Taniguchi ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-01-27 | (S) The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-11 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to EDU, WAM. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |