HI SB823 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB823
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides an exemption for flatbed trucks from registration renewals and initial registrations of motor carrier vehicles when used as marine terminal equipment temporarily moving in or between certain terminals. Adds new terminal locales, times, and roadways to be covered under the exemption. Effective 6/30/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Motor Vehicle Registration.
Sponsors
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Brenton Awa [R] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-03-30 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2023-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 03-30-23 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Perruso excused (1). |
2023-03-16 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1253) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2023-03-14 | House | The committee on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Todd, Kila, Aiu, Evslin, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, Marten, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-03-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Tuesday, 03-14-23 10:00AM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to TRN, CPC, referral sheet 17 |
2023-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2023-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 279) in amended form (SD 2). |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 787) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2023-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Richards, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-23-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 231) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Elefante, Keohokalole, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Referred to TCA, CPN. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB704 (Same As)
SB823 (Carry Over) 2023-03-30 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
SB823 (Carry Over) 2023-03-30 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.