HI SB826 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts from gift reporting requirements under the ethics code those gifts received by an elected or appointed official on behalf of the State; requires the gift to be recorded in a public record as the property of the State; provides that upon the end of the official's term of office the gift may remain with the official's agency or the agency may transfer the gift to the state archives or state foundation on culture and the arts, as appropriate.
Title
Ethics; Gift Reporting
Sponsors
Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB611 (Same As) 2014-07-08 - Act 205, 7/2/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1315).
HB2451 (Same As) 2014-01-27 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 7
HB2451 (Same As) 2014-01-27 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 7
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=826&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/SB826_.HTM |