HI SB827 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the ERS to require departments and agencies of the state and county governments to provide accurate payroll and personnel information to the ERS. Establishes penalties and remedies for the failure to provide required information to the ERS.
Title
Employees' Retirement System; Reporting of Payment Changes or Errors
Sponsors
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=827&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB827_.HTM |