HI SB858 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Proposes amendments to the Constitution of the State of Hawaii to expressly provide that the legislature may authorize the counties to issue tax increment bonds. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposing Amendments To Article Vii, Sections 12 And 13, Of The Hawaii Constitution To Authorize The Counties To Issue Tax Increment Bonds And To Exclude Tax Increment Bonds From Determinations Of The Funded Debt Of The Counties.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-12SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-02-12SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 211) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-02-05SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-01-31SenateThe committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-19 9:00AM in conference room 016.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to JDC, WAM.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB541 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 4

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback