HI SB930 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB930
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Hawaii climate change mitigation and adaptation commission and coordinator to assist the State and counties with developing and implementing various sea level rise adaptation plans and climate change mitigation efforts. Appropriate funds to support the Hawaii climate change initiative.
Title
Relating To Climate Change.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from AEN/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 627) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Fevella. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, Fevella. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-19 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to AEN/WTL, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB930 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Climate Change
Hawaii Climate Change Mitigation and Adaptation Commission
Hawaii Climate Change Mitigation and Adaptation Coordinator
Climate Change
Hawaii Climate Change Mitigation and Adaptation Commission
Hawaii Climate Change Mitigation and Adaptation Coordinator