HI SB947 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Act 259, 07/05/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1361).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits the disability of a parent or caregiver from being the sole factor in determining fitness as a foster parent, adoptive parent, guardian, parent seeking custody or visitation, or provider of a safe family home. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Families.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-09SenateAct 259, 07/05/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1361).
2019-07-09HouseAct 259, on 07/05/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1361).
2019-05-03SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2019-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
2019-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2019-04-26HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 965).
2019-04-26SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-04-26HouseDeferred one day 04-30-19.
2019-04-24HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Friday, 04-26-19.
2019-04-24HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 7) as amended in (CD 1).
2019-04-24Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-26-19.
2019-04-24SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 7).
2019-04-18HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, C. Lee, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-18SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-04-17SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-18-19 2:15PM in conference room 225.
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 809).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: San Buenaventura, C. Lee Co-Chairs; Ward.
2019-04-12HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 899).
2019-04-12SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Ruderman Chair; K. Rhoads Co-Chair; Riviere, Fevella.
2019-04-09HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 885).
2019-04-09SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2019-04-09SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 677).
2019-04-05HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Mizuno, Nishimoto excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-04-05HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2133), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-04-03HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2019-04-02HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-03-19 2:05PM in conference room 325.
2019-04-02HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-03-19 2:05pm.
2019-03-29HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-02-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-03-29HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-02-19 at 2:00pm.
2019-03-27HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 03-29-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
2019-03-20HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Yamane excused (2).
2019-03-20HouseReported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1453) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2019-03-15HouseThe committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Nakamura, Belatti, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward.
2019-03-12HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HSH on Friday, 03-15-19 9:00AM in House conference room 329.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to HSH, JUD, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 304) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-03-05SenateReport Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-01SenateOne Day Notice 03-05-19.
2019-03-01SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1019) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-26SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-02-21SenateThe committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-26-19 9:00AM in conference room 016.
2019-02-12SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2019-02-12SenateReported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 234) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2019-02-04SenateThe committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Ihara, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-02-01SenateThe committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-19 3:10PM in conference room 016.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to HMS, JDC.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB674 (Same As) 2019-01-24 - Referred to HSH, JUD, referral sheet 5

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback