HI SB951 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Act 150, 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1251).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Act 150, 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1251).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Updates the State's mortgage loan origination law to clarify: persons subject to criminal history disclosures and criminal history background checks on applications for licensure and change in control of the licensee; procedures for change in control of a licensee; persons who must disclose their relevant criminal history and criminal history background checks upon application for licensure and change of control of the licensee; criminal background check fee requirements; and conditions under which an employee performing mortgage loan origination activities for a nonprofit is exempt from registration and licensure as a mortgage loan originator. Effective 9/1/2017. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Mortgage Loan Origination.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-11 | Senate | Act 150, 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1251). |
2017-07-11 | House | Act 150, on 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1251). |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642). |
2017-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737). |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-27 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17. |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 63) as amended in (CD 1). |
2017-04-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 63). |
2017-04-25 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Takumi, Choy, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, S. Chang; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-17 2:30PM in conference room 016. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-17 2:30PM in conference room 016. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-17 2:30PM in conference room 016. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 681). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Taniguchi Co-Chair; S. Chang. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 587). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Ohno, Takumi, Choy Co-Chairs; Ward. |
2017-04-07 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 540). |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 495). |
2017-04-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro, Saiki, Say excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-04-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1683), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-03-31 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2017-03-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 03-31-17 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-03-24 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6). |
2017-03-24 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1319), recommending referral to FIN. |
2017-03-22 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ito, Say, Takayama, Todd, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Aquino, Fukumoto. |
2017-03-17 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-22-17 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2017-03-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McKelvey, Oshiro, Souki excused (4). |
2017-03-17 | House | Reported from IAC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1133) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2017-03-15 | House | The committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Choy, Cachola, Ito, Onishi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson. |
2017-03-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by IAC on Wednesday, 03-15-17 9:00AM in House conference room 429. |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to IAC, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2017-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 305) in amended form (SD 2). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 826) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2017-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Inouye, K. Kahele, Shimabukuro. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-17 1:35PM in conference room 211. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 258) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Kidani. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-17 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1085 (Same As) 2017-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
Subjects
Background Checks
Change in Control
Division of Financial Institutions
Mortgage Loan Originators
Secure and Fair Enforcement for Mortgage Licensing Act
Change in Control
Division of Financial Institutions
Mortgage Loan Originators
Secure and Fair Enforcement for Mortgage Licensing Act