HI SB960 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB960
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to HWN, JDC.
Pending: Senate Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to HWN, JDC.
Pending: Senate Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that certain records of the Department of Hawaiian Home lands are not be required to be publicly disclosed or made open to inspection pursuant to public records requests. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Personal Privacy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | Senate | Re-Referred to HWN, JDC. |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 193) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Galuteria, English, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-17 1:15PM in conference room 016. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred to HWN, JDL. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1094 (Same As) 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
SB960 (Carry Over) 2017-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
SB960 (Carry Over) 2017-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.