HI SB964 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB964
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of general obligation bonds and appropriate funds for the construction of an invertebrate and plant propagation facility and baseyard improvements on Oahu, a predator proof fence on Oahu, and a predator proof fence on Maui.
Title
Relating To Species Conservation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from AEN/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 631) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Fevella. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, Fevella. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-19 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to AEN/WTL, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB964 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
HB341 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 3
HB341 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Construction
Endangered Hawaiian Snail Conservation
General Obligation Bonds
Propagation Facility
Construction
Endangered Hawaiian Snail Conservation
General Obligation Bonds
Propagation Facility
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=964&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB964_.HTM |