HI SCR101 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 682).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 682).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging A Transition To A Plant-based Lifestyle.
Title
Urging A Transition To A Plant-based Lifestyle.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-25 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 2 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 682). |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 753). |
2024-04-15 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-04-15 | House | Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ganaden, Garcia, Hashem, Holt, Poepoe excused (6). |
2024-04-15 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1922-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. |
2024-04-12 | House | The committee on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Kahaloa, Lowen, Perruso; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran, Woodson, Ward. |
2024-04-12 | House | Re-referred to AGR, referral sheet 30 |
2024-04-09 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 04-12-24 10:00AM in conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-04-05 | House | Referred to AGR, EEP, referral sheet 27 |
2024-04-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 402). |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 7 (Senator(s) Awa, Elefante, Keohokalole, Kim, McKelvey, Richards, San Buenaventura). Transmitted to House. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-24. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3430) with recommendation of adoption. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) DeCoite; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Richards, Awa. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-24 1:01PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred to AEN. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR83 (Same As) 2024-04-04 - Report and Resolution Adopted. Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 7 (Senator(s) Awa, Elefante, Keohokalole, Kim, McKelvey, Richards, San Buenaventura).