HI SCR104 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Human Services To Consider An Alternate Methodology For Establishing The Basic Prospective Payment System Rates For Intermediate Care Facilities For Individuals With Intellectual Disabilities, To Rebase The Rates At Least Every Two Fiscal Years, And To Increase Bed Reservation Days To Twenty-four Days Per Calendar Year For Hospitalization And Other Absences Of Residents From Intermediate Care Facilities For Individuals With Intellectual Disabilities.
Title
DHS; Intermediate Care Facilities For Individuals With Intellectual Disabilities
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] |
Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-01 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Reported from HTH/HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1254), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on HSH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HSH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Harimoto, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Gabbard, Riviere, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Baker, Slom. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH/HSH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-31-15 1:20PM in conference room 016. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Referred to HTH/HSH, WAM. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=104&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/SCR104_.HTM |