HI SCR123 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR123
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-05 - Referred to LHE/PVM, FIN, referral sheet 50
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-05 - Referred to LHE/PVM, FIN, referral sheet 50
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The University Of Hawaii, In Conjunction With The Department Of Public Safety And Department Of Land And Natural Resources Division Of Conservation And Resources Enforcement, To Strengthen And Enhance The School-to-career Pipeline For Positions In Public Safety.
Title
Urging The University Of Hawaii, In Conjunction With The Department Of Public Safety And Department Of Land And Natural Resources Division Of Conservation And Resources Enforcement, To Strengthen And Enhance The School-to-career Pipeline For Positions In Public Safety.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-05 | House | Referred to LHE/PVM, FIN, referral sheet 50 |
2019-04-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 619) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-19. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1836) with recommendation of adoption. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Taniguchi. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-19 10:20AM in conference room 211. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Reported from HRE/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1547), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Fevella. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Fevella. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-19 2:30PM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Referred to HRE/PSM, WAM. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR123 (Carry Over) 2019-04-05 - Referred to LHE/PVM, FIN, referral sheet 50