HI SCR125 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-23 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Ward excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-23 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Ward excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Commerce And Consumer Affairs And The American Association For Marriage And Family Therapy: Hawaii Division, To Develop Draft Legislation Establishing, Implementing, And Monitoring Continuing Education Requirements For All Licensed Marriage And Family Therapists In Hawaii.
Title
Licensed Marriage and Family Therapists; Continuing Education; Department of Commerce and Consumer Affairs
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
Sen. Sam Slom [R] | Sen. Malama Solomon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-23 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Ward excused (1). |
2013-04-23 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1734), recommending referral to CPC. |
2013-04-19 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Cabanilla, Kobayashi, Woodson, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Jordan. |
2013-04-16 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 04-19-13 8:30AM in conference room 229. |
2013-04-11 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 52 |
2013-04-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 440) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-03-13. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Reported from HMS/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1220) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Kidani, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Taniguchi. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS deferred the measure until 03-28-13 1:30PM in conference room 016. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Solomon, Slom. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-13 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Referred to HMS/CPN. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=125&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/SCR125_.HTM |