HI SCR135 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-22 - (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-19-12.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-22 - (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-19-12.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expressing Support For The Department Of Agriculture's Efforts To Stimulate The State's Agriculture Industry, Increase And Diversify Agricultural Output, And Promote Food Security.
Title
Agricultural Development and Food Security
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-22 | (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-19-12. | |
2012-04-27 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 702). | |
2012-04-26 | (S) Resolution adopted in final form. | |
2012-04-26 | (H) Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-04-26 | (H) Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2012-04-26 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1820-12), recommending adoption. | |
2012-04-20 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Lee, Choy, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Oshiro, Cullen, Giugni, Ward. | |
2012-04-18 | (H) Scheduled for decision making on Friday, 04-20-12 3:15PM in conference room 308. | |
2012-04-17 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Say, Takumi excused (2). | |
2012-04-17 | (H) Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1781-12), recommending referral to FIN. | |
2012-04-13 | (H) The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Hashem, Choy, McKelvey, Tokioka, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Awana, Brower, Evans, Nishimoto, Marumoto. | |
2012-04-11 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 04-13-12 11:00AM in conference room 312. | |
2012-04-04 | (H) Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 59 | |
2012-04-02 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 445). | |
2012-04-02 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. | |
2012-03-30 | (S) One Day Notice 04-02-12. | |
2012-03-30 | (S) Reported from AGL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3071) with recommendation of adoption. | |
2012-03-27 | (S) The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AGL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Kahele, Chun Oakland, Kouchi, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Tokuda, Slom. | |
2012-03-21 | (S) The committee(s) on AGL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-12 2:45PM in conference room 229. | |
2012-03-16 | (S) Referred to AGL. | |
2012-03-14 | (S) Offered. |