HI SCR157 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR157
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-03 - Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 49
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-03 - Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 49
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Agriculture To Develop A Sustainable Food Security Strategic Plan And Prepare An Annual Report To The Legislature.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Agriculture To Develop A Sustainable Food Security Strategic Plan And Prepare An Annual Report To The Legislature.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | House | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 49 |
2019-04-01 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 547). |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-01-19. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1657) with recommendation of adoption. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, K. Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, L. Thielen. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-19 2:25PM in conference room 224. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred to AEN. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR157 (Carry Over) 2019-04-03 - Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 49
HCR81 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 33
HCR81 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 33
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=157&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SCR157_.HTM |