HI SCR166 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Convening Of A Task Force To Study The Social, Economic, And Religious Impacts Of Enacting Marriage Equality In Hawaii.
Title
Social, Economic, and Religious Impacts of Enacting Marriage Equality in Hawaii
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-07 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 746). |
2013-04-25 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-25 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cheape, Fale, Fukumoto, Johanson, Ward voting no (5) and Representative(s) McDermott, Thielen excused (2). |
2013-04-25 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1764), recommending adoption. |
2013-04-23 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Belatti, Brower, Cabanilla, Kawakami, C. Lee, Wooley, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Carroll, Ito, Tsuji, McDermott. |
2013-04-19 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 04-23-13 10:30AM in conference room 325. |
2013-04-11 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 52 |
2013-04-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 454). |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Resolution Adopted. Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara, Kidani, Kouchi. Noes, 3 (Senator(s) Baker, L. Thielen, Slom). Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-05-13. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Waived referral to WAM. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1127), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-13 10:30AM in conference room 016. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=166&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/SCR166_.HTM |