HI SCR191 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ganaden, Garcia, Hashem, Holt, Poepoe, Yamashita excused (7).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ganaden, Garcia, Hashem, Holt, Poepoe, Yamashita excused (7).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Agriculture To Adopt Proposed Amendments To Chapter 4-72, Hawaii Administrative Rules, That Provide Important Authorities For The Department To Prevent The Spread Of Insects, Diseases, And Other Invasive Pests Within The State.
Title
Urging The Department Of Agriculture To Adopt Proposed Amendments To Chapter 4-72, Hawaii Administrative Rules, That Provide Important Authorities For The Department To Prevent The Spread Of Insects, Diseases, And Other Invasive Pests Within The State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-01 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ganaden, Garcia, Hashem, Holt, Poepoe, Yamashita excused (7). |
2024-04-15 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1905-24), recommending referral to CPC. |
2024-04-12 | House | The committee on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Kahaloa, Lowen, Perruso; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran, Woodson, Ward. |
2024-04-09 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 04-12-24 10:00AM in conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-04-05 | House | Referred to AGR, CPC, referral sheet 28 |
2024-04-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 454). |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-24. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3502) with recommendation of adoption. |
2024-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite, Awa. |
2024-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN deferred the measure until 04-01-24 1:01PM; Conference Room 224. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-24 1:00PM; CR 224 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred to AEN. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR163 (Same As) 2024-04-04 - Report and Resolution Adopted.