HI SCR200 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR200
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Public Utilities Commission To Consider Reasonable Ratemaking Treatment And Cost-effective Solutions To Lessen The Burden Of Energy Costs On Low- And Limited-income And Special Medical Needs Customers.
Title
Requesting The Public Utilities Commission To Consider Reasonable Ratemaking Treatment And Cost-effective Solutions To Lessen The Burden Of Energy Costs On Low- And Limited-income And Special Medical Needs Customers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4). |
2019-04-15 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2229), recommending referral to CPC. |
2019-04-11 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Tarnas, Todd; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Thielen; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Yamane. |
2019-04-08 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 04-11-19 9:40AM in conference room 325. |
2019-04-05 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 50 |
2019-04-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 578) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 2). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-03-19. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1681) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-19 10:20AM in conference room 211. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1530), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-19 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR200 (Carry Over) 2019-04-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
HCR91 (Same As) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
HCR91 (Same As) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).