HI SCR45 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR45
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-05 - Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 50
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-05 - Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 50
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Supporting The Governor's Efforts In Investigating And Urging The Bank Of America To Return To Hawaii To Meet With Na Poe Kokua And The Hawaii Fair Lending Coalition Regarding A $150,000,000 Loan Commitment For Native Hawaiians On Hawaiian Homelands.
Title
Supporting The Governor's Efforts In Investigating And Urging The Bank Of America To Return To Hawaii To Meet With Na Poe Kokua And The Hawaii Fair Lending Coalition Regarding A $150,000,000 Loan Commitment For Native Hawaiians On Hawaiian Homelands.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-05 | House | Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 50 |
2019-04-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 594) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-19. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1802) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Ihara, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Fevella. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-19 1:15PM in conference room 016. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-19-19 1:17PM in conference room 016. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-19 1:17PM in conference room 016. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to HWN. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR45 (Carry Over) 2019-04-05 - Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 50