HI SCR61 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - Referred to EDN, PBS, referral sheet 47
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - Referred to EDN, PBS, referral sheet 47
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Encouraging The Department Of Education To Promote Increased Participation By Schools In The Community Emergency Response Team Program.
Title
Department of Education; Emergency Management; Community Emergency Response Team Program
Sponsors
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-08 | House | Referred to EDN, PBS, referral sheet 47 |
2016-04-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 432). |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3376) with recommendation of adoption. |
2016-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Espero, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Slom. |
2016-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has rescheduled its public hearing to 04-05-16 1:30PM in conference room 229. |
2016-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-05-16 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to PSM. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2977), with recommendation of referral to PSM. |
2016-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, K.Kahele, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Slom. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU deferred the measure until 03-18-16 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-16 1:25PM in conference room 229. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Referred to EDU, PSM. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=61&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SCR61_.HTM |