HI SCR80 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-07 - (H) Referred to HED/EDN, FIN, referral sheet 54
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-07 - (H) Referred to HED/EDN, FIN, referral sheet 54
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting Reports On The Feasibility Of Using Existing Teleconferencing And Videoconferencing Facilities For University Of Hawaii Board Of Regents And Board Of Education Meetings.
Title
University Of Hawaii; Department of Education; Meetings (SD1)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-07 | (H) Referred to HED/EDN, FIN, referral sheet 54 | |
2011-04-05 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 395) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2011-04-05 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-04-04 | (S) One Day Notice 04-05-11. | |
2011-04-04 | (S) Reported from EDU/EDT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1044) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | |
2011-03-28 | (S) The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kidani, Nishihara, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Slom. | |
2011-03-28 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Fukunaga, Wakai, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Solomon, Slom. | |
2011-03-22 | (S) The committee(s) on EDU/EDT has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-11 1:30PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-03-16 | (S) Referred to EDU/EDT. | |
2011-03-11 | (S) Offered. |