HI SCR88 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-05 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-04-14.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-05 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-04-14.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Approving The Selection Of Danny Kaleikini To Be Inducted Into The Aloha Order Of Merit.
Title
Danny Kaleikini; Aloha Order of Merit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-05 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-04-14. |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 723). |
2014-04-24 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-04-24 | House | Adopted with Representative(s) Cullen voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro, Woodson excused (2). |
2014-04-24 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-15-14. |
2014-04-24 | House | Re-referred to OMH, referral sheet 59 |
2014-04-15 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on VMI with Representative(s) Cullen voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Oshiro, Wooley excused (3). |
2014-04-15 | House | Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1676-14), recommending referral to VMI. |
2014-04-14 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Evans, Kawakami, Say, Nishimoto, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cullen, C. Lee, Lowen. |
2014-04-14 | House | Resolution re-scheduled for decision making by OMH on Monday, 04-14-14 1:50PM in conference room 312. |
2014-04-11 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Monday, 04-14-14 11:45AM in conference room 312. |
2014-04-11 | House | The committee(s) on OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-14-14 at 11:45AM. |
2014-04-09 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Friday, 04-11-14 11:30AM in conference room 325. |
2014-04-09 | House | The committee(s) on OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-11-14 at 11:30AM. |
2014-04-04 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by OMH on Wednesday, 04-09-14 10:00AM in conference room 325. |
2014-04-03 | House | Referred to OMH, VMI, referral sheet 49 |
2014-04-01 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 423). |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2014-03-31 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-01-14. |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Reported from TEC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3153) with recommendation of adoption. |
2014-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TEC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ihara. |
2014-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-14 1:15PM in conference room 414. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Referred to TEC. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=88&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/bills/SCR88_.HTM |