HI SCR88 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-16-15.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-16-15.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Information Privacy And Security Council, In Cooperation With The State Chief Information Officer Council, To Assess Existing Procedures Of Notification Following The Breach Of Personal Information.
Title
Office of Information Management and Technology; Personal Information; Data Breach; Working Group; Establishment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-16 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-16-15. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 672). |
2015-05-01 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-05-01 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and McDermott, Oshiro, Say, Tokioka excused (4). |
2015-05-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1701), recommending adoption. |
2015-04-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Ward. |
2015-04-24 | House | Resolution scheduled for decision making on Monday, 04-27-15 2:05PM in conference room 308. |
2015-04-20 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Har, Ito, Rhoads excused (3). |
2015-04-20 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1666), recommending referral to FIN. |
2015-04-16 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, C. Lee. |
2015-04-13 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 04-16-15 2:05PM in conference room 325. |
2015-04-10 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 49 |
2015-04-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 452) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1377) with recommendation of adoption. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, Gabbard, Ihara, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 04-06-15 9:29AM in conference room 016. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1251), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to JDL. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Nishihara, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Slom. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-31-15 1:30PM in conference room 414. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Referred to GVO, JDL. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Offered. |