HI SR107 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Board Of Education, As Part Of Its Development Of A Comprehensive Hawaiian Studies Program, To Create A Coalition To Address The Issue Of Developing Assessments In The Hawaiian Language For Hawaiian Language Immersion Students To More Accurately Measure Their Academic Achievement.
Title
Board of Education; Hawaiian Language Immersion Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-07 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 2). |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1540) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 2). |
2013-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 04-05-13 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-13 9:50AM in conference room 211. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Reported from EDU/THA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1092), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on THA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in THA were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Galuteria, Keith-Agaran, Kahele, Kidani, Shimabukuro, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Hee, Solomon. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kidani, Shimabukuro, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU/THA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-13 1:15PM in conference room 414. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Referred to EDU/THA, WAM. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=107&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/SR107_.HTM |