HI SR27 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-30 - (S) Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-30 - (S) Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Land And Natural Resources To Transfer A Portion Of The Revenue Derived From The Conveyance Or Transfer Of Any Land Of The Public Land Trust To The Office Of Hawaiian Affairs.
Title
Office of Hawaiian Affairs; Department of Land and Natural Resources; Attorney General; Public Land Trust
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-30 | (S) Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2012-03-30 | (S) Reported from WLH/HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3118), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. | |
2012-03-23 | (S) The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Galuteria, Ryan, Kidani, Solomon, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Hee, Kahele. | |
2012-03-23 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WLH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Solomon, Ryan, Shimabukuro, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Tokuda. | |
2012-03-20 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH/HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-12 2:55PM in conference room 224. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Referred to WLH/HWN, WAM. | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Offered. |