HI SR33 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-22 - (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-19-12.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-22 - (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-19-12.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Counties To Preserve Property Tax Exemptions For Kuleana Lands.
Title
Kuleana Lands; Property Taxes
Sponsors
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Gilbert Kahele [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Malama Solomon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-22 | (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-19-12. | |
2012-04-10 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted. | |
2012-04-05 | (S) One Day Notice 04-10-12. | |
2012-04-05 | (S) Reported from HWN/PGM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3211) with recommendation of adoption. | |
2012-03-28 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PGM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Kidani, Ryan; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Slom. | |
2012-03-28 | (S) The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HWN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Galuteria, Ryan, English, Kahele, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Hee, Solomon, Slom. | |
2012-03-23 | (S) The committee(s) on HWN/PGM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-12 3:15PM in conference room 224. | |
2012-03-16 | (S) Referred to HWN/PGM. | |
2012-03-09 | (S) Offered. |