HI SR5 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SR5
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Education To Develop And Implement A Program To Recruit And Employ Qualified Blind Persons To Serve As Orientation And Mobility Instructors, And In Other Positions, As Teachers Of Visually Impaired Students.
Title
Urging The Department Of Education To Develop And Implement A Program To Recruit And Employ Qualified Blind Persons To Serve As Orientation And Mobility Instructors, And In Other Positions, As Teachers Of Visually Impaired Students.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-06 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-04-06 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-07-22. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Reported from HMS/EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3721) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Misalucha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Acasio. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kim, Dela Cruz. |
2022-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS/EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-31-22 3:10PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Referred to HMS/EDU. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR5 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
HR11 (Same As) 2022-03-31 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Hashem, D. Kobayashi, Ohno excused (4).
SCR1 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
HR11 (Same As) 2022-03-31 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Hashem, D. Kobayashi, Ohno excused (4).
SCR1 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Subjects
Deaf and Blind
Department of Education
National Blindness Professional Certification Board
National Orientation and Mobility Certification
Structured Discovery Cane Travel
Visually Impaired Students
Department of Education
National Blindness Professional Certification Board
National Orientation and Mobility Certification
Structured Discovery Cane Travel
Visually Impaired Students