HI SR7 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SR7
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Legislative Reference Bureau To Conduct A Study On The Feasibility Of The State Establishing A Universal, No-cost Pre-kindergarten Program.
Title
Requesting The Legislative Reference Bureau To Conduct A Study On The Feasibility Of The State Establishing A Universal, No-cost Pre-kindergarten Program.
Sponsors
Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-06 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-07-22. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3778) with recommendation of adoption. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-05-22 10:40AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3523), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2022-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Fevella. |
2022-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-22 3:15PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR7 (Carry Over) 2021-02-17 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
SCR13 (Same As) 2022-04-19 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashimoto, McKelvey, Ward excused (3).
SCR13 (Same As) 2022-04-19 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashimoto, McKelvey, Ward excused (3).