IA HF2157 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-12 - Withdrawn. H.J. 487.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-12 - Withdrawn. H.J. 487.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to state agency decision making. (See Cmte. Bill HF 2385)
Title
A bill for an act relating to state agency decision making. (See Cmte. Bill HF 2385)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-12 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 487. |
2014-02-19 | House | Passed subcommittee. |
2014-02-06 | House | Subcommittee, Pettengill, Hunter, and Stanerson. H.J. 184. |
2014-02-05 | House | Introduced, referred to State Government. H.J. 173. |